NJ A4587 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes State sales and use tax and hotel and motel occupancy fee on transient accommodations; authorizes various municipal taxes and fees on transient accommodations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes State sales and use tax and hotel and motel occupancy fee on transient accommodations; authorizes various municipal taxes and fees on transient accommodations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2574 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31AssemblyAbsolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
2017-06-19SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-13)
2017-06-19SenateSubstituted for S2574 (SCS)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-05-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (45-29-0)
2017-05-11AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-05-11AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2017-02-27AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2017-02-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2574 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4587 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback