NJ A4587 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.158.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires facilities providing services to persons with developmental disabilities and schools to adopt policies permitting administration of medical marijuana to qualifying patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires facilities providing services to persons with developmental disabilities and schools to adopt policies permitting administration of medical marijuana to qualifying patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3049 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3049 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-09SenateApproved P.L.2015, c.158.
2015-06-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-4)
2015-06-29SenateSubstituted for S3049
2015-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2015-06-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (59-9-10)
2015-06-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2015-06-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3049 (Same As) 2015-06-29 - Substituted by A4587

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback