NJ A4582 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-10-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.225.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $32.5 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to State Agriculture Development Committee for county planning incentive grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $32.5 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to State Agriculture Development Committee for county planning incentive grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2990 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.225.
2017-06-19SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2017-06-19SenateSubstituted for S2990 (1R)
2017-05-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-05-01SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
2017-03-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2017-03-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-02-13AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2017-02-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2990 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4582 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback