NJ A4547 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires collection and reporting of information concerning crimes against the elderly and disabled.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires collection and reporting of information concerning crimes against the elderly and disabled.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2019-01-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3120 (Same As) 2018-10-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback