NJ A4520 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on September 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-10 - Approved P.L.2020, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Temporarily extends deadline to register vehicle and obtain driver's license for new State residents during COVID-19 public health emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporarily extends deadline to register vehicle and obtain driver's license for new State residents during COVID-19 public health emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2803 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-10SenateApproved P.L.2020, c.78.
2020-08-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2020-08-27SenateSubstituted for S2803 (1R)
2020-08-27SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-08-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2020-08-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-08-24AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-08-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2803 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4520 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback