NJ A4518 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A773
Note: Carry Foward to future S1039
Note: Carry Foward to future S1039
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalty for "bombing" online meeting or teleconference under certain circumstances.
Title
Increases penalty for "bombing" online meeting or teleconference under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerard Scharfenberger [R] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Rep. Serena DiMaso [R] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4518 (Carry Over) 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4518 (Carry Over) 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2845 (Same As) 2020-08-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4518 (Carry Over) 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2845 (Same As) 2020-08-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee