NJ A4504 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2922
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2922
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises standard for presence of medical examiner during removal of anatomical gift from decedent.
Title
Revises standard for presence of medical examiner during removal of anatomical gift from decedent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted by S2922 |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2922 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.49.