NJ A4486 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Michael Anthony Fornicola's Law"; requires hotels to have automated external defibrillators in certain areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Michael Anthony Fornicola's Law"; requires hotels to have automated external defibrillators in certain areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-2-0)
2018-12-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-09-24AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3024 (Same As) 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback