NJ A4482 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes minimum wage requirements for certain long-term care facility staff; establishes direct care ratio requirements for nursing homes; requires nursing home care rate study.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes minimum wage requirements for certain long-term care facility staff; establishes direct care ratio requirements for nursing homes; requires nursing home care rate study.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2758 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16SenateApproved P.L.2020, c.89.
2020-08-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-2)
2020-08-27SenateSubstituted for S2758 (2R)
2020-08-27SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-08-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (49-16-12)
2020-08-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-08-24AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-07-30AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2758 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4482 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback