NJ A4475 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S3125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S3125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Repayment Assistance Program and Household Income Affordable Repayment Plan for borrowers of New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program.
Title
Establishes Repayment Assistance Program and Household Income Affordable Repayment Plan for borrowers of New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S3125 |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3125 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Approved P.L.2019, c.62.