NJ A4454 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.32.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.32.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to include instruction on diversity and inclusion as part of implementation of New Jersey Student Learning Standards.
Title
Requires school districts to include instruction on diversity and inclusion as part of implementation of New Jersey Student Learning Standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2781 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2781 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.32. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-29-0) |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-13) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Motion To Table Sa (25-15) (Weinberg) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Pennacchio) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S2781 (1R) |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (52-10-10) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2781 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4454 (2R)