NJ A4449 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.166.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes crime of soliciting transfer of firearm by disqualified person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes crime of soliciting transfer of firearm by disqualified person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2808 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.166.
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted for S2808
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-4-3)
2019-06-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-13AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-09-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2808 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4449

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback