NJ A4434 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Student Wellness Grant Program in DOE.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Student Wellness Grant Program in DOE.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2716 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2021-06-24SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2021-06-24SenateSubstituted for S2716 (1R)
2021-06-21SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Beach)
2021-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2021-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2021-03-01AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-0-0)
2020-12-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-07-23AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2716 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A4434 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback