NJ A4432 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.221.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.221.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides increased tax credit amounts under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program for certain businesses that have collaborative research relationships with colleges or universities.*
Title
Provides increased tax credit amounts under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program for certain businesses that have collaborative research relationships with colleges or universities.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2841 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.221. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (32-0) (Cunningham) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2841 (SCS) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (65-8-5) |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2841 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A4432 (ACS)