NJ A4430 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises requirements for long-term care facilities to establish outbreak response plans.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises requirements for long-term care facilities to establish outbreak response plans.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2021-03-25AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2020-10-29AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2020-10-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-07-20AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2798 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback