NJ A4408 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts to notify State Board of Examiners when teaching staff member fails to report child abuse for determination of revocation or suspension of certificate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts to notify State Board of Examiners when teaching staff member fails to report child abuse for determination of revocation or suspension of certificate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31AssemblySubstituted by S2714
2018-11-26AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-09-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2714 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.46.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback