NJ A4393 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1438
Note: Carry Foward to future S2196
Note: Carry Foward to future S2196
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases maximum penalty for certain violations concerning asbestos hazard abatement; allocates moneys from increased penalties to asbestos programs.
Title
Increases maximum penalty for certain violations concerning asbestos hazard abatement; allocates moneys from increased penalties to asbestos programs.
Sponsors
Rep. James Kennedy [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4393 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A4393 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S2659 (Same As) 2020-07-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4393 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S2659 (Same As) 2020-07-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee