NJ A4389 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits issuance of certain badges to NJT board members, PANYNJ commissioners, and local and State elected officials.
Title
Prohibits issuance of certain badges to NJT board members, PANYNJ commissioners, and local and State elected officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2858 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2858 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.221.