NJ A4379 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A1269

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Employment Application Registry database in Division of State Police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Employment Application Registry database in Division of State Police.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2021-05-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2021-05-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-07-02AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4379 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2693 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback