NJ A4369 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1868
Note: Carry Foward to future S2282
Note: Carry Foward to future S2282
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits possession and requires registration of body armor in certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits possession and requires registration of body armor in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4369 (Carry Over) 2022-06-23 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4369 (Carry Over) 2022-06-23 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2847 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4369 (Carry Over) 2022-06-23 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2847 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading