NJ A4365 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S2921
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S2921
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises various provisions of Food Desert Relief Program.
Title
Revises various provisions of Food Desert Relief Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. William Spearman [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2921 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2921 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - Approved P.L.2022, c.47.