NJ A4357 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3086
Note: Carry Foward to future S1388
Note: Carry Over of previous S1256
Note: Carry Over of previous A3979
Note: Carry Foward to future S1388
Note: Carry Over of previous S1256
Note: Carry Over of previous A3979
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits inclusion of volunteer firefighters and other emergency responders within municipal eligible employee group for purposes of the small employer health benefits plan statutes.
Title
Permits inclusion of volunteer firefighters and other emergency responders within municipal eligible employee group for purposes of the small employer health benefits plan statutes.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] | Rep. Bethanne McCarthy Patrick [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Kim Eulner [R] |
Rep. Marilyn Piperno [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4357 (Carry Over) 2022-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4357 (Carry Over) 2022-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S331 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1256 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3979 (Carry Over) 2020-05-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4357 (Carry Over) 2022-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S331 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1256 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3979 (Carry Over) 2020-05-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A4357 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A4500/4357_I1.HTM |