NJ A4352 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.102.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.102.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for elimination of newly formed non-operating school districts; establishes procedures for eliminating deficit that existed prior to merger; authorizes renting of school building for 10 years.
Title
Provides for elimination of newly formed non-operating school districts; establishes procedures for eliminating deficit that existed prior to merger; authorizes renting of school building for 10 years.
Sponsors
Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2843 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2843 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.102. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-3-1) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-1) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2843 (1R) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (65-4-1) |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2843 (Same As) 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A4352 (1R)