NJ A4345 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.160.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires safety education training twice per calendar year for school bus drivers and school bus aides.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires safety education training twice per calendar year for school bus drivers and school bus aides.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2853 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.160.
2018-10-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
2018-10-29SenateSubstituted for S2853 (1R)
2018-10-29SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2018-10-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-08-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2853 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A4345 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback