NJ A4343 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes linked deposit program allowing State Treasurer to deposit State funds at below market interest rates with certain banks.
Title
Establishes linked deposit program allowing State Treasurer to deposit State funds at below market interest rates with certain banks.
Sponsors
Rep. Angel Fuentes [D] | Rep. Charles Mainor [D] | Rep. Ruben Ramos [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-12-15 | Passed by the Assembly (42-29-0) | |
2011-12-08 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-11-28 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3081 (Same As) 2011-11-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading