NJ A4337 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1661
Note: Carry Foward to future S3217
Note: Carry Foward to future S3217
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility of inmates for medical parole and requires inmate's enrollment in Medicaid under certain circumstances.
Title
Expands eligibility of inmates for medical parole and requires inmate's enrollment in Medicaid under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Sen. Peter Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3008 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3008 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3008 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (22-10) |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Substituted for S3008 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (47-29-3) |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4337 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A4337 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S3008 (Same As) 2015-07-23 - Substituted by A4337
A4337 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S3008 (Same As) 2015-07-23 - Substituted by A4337