NJ A4327 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2397
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2732
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2732
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY 2017 to include new projects and revise allowable loan amounts for already approved projects.
Title
Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY 2017 to include new projects and revise allowable loan amounts for already approved projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted by S2732 |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4327 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2732
S2732 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.14.
S2732 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.14.