NJ A4298 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblySubstituted by S2498
2020-06-25AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-06-25AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-06-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2498 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.48.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback