NJ A4285 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Commissioner of Health to develop voluntary registry to collect cancer incidence data from firefighters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Commissioner of Health to develop voluntary registry to collect cancer incidence data from firefighters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2018-12-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3313 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback