NJ A4284 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5904
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-01-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-01-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates fee for special plates for firefighters and members of first aid or rescue squads.
Title
Eliminates fee for special plates for firefighters and members of first aid or rescue squads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2025-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-09-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5904 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
S3366 (Same As) 2025-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3366 (Same As) 2025-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee