NJ A4261 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for collection of sales tax from certain remote sellers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for collection of sales tax from certain remote sellers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2794 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2018-08-27AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2018-08-27AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2018-07-01SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (22-15)
2018-07-01SenateSubstituted for S2794 (1R)
2018-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (44-27-2)
2018-06-25AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-06-21AssemblyIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

S2794 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A4261 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback