NJ A4255 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.64.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.64.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law requiring registration with DEP of certain entities engaged in soil and fill recycling services.
Title
Revises law requiring registration with DEP of certain entities engaged in soil and fill recycling services.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Shama Haider [D] | Rep. James Kennedy [D] | Sen. Robert Smith [D] |
Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Rep. Ellen Park [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2870 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2870 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.64. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2870 |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2870 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A4255