NJ A4250 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises law concerning notaries and notarial acts; authorizes electronic signatures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises law concerning notaries and notarial acts; authorizes electronic signatures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-07-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (53-20-1)
2020-07-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-11AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2508 (Same As) 2020-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback