NJ A4238 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5592
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Substituted by S553 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Substituted by S553 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds technology transfer duties to New Jersey Commission on Science, Innovation and Technology.
Title
Adds technology transfer duties to New Jersey Commission on Science, Innovation and Technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S553 (1R) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S553 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.204.
A5592 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5592 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading