NJ A4223 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1860
Note: Carry Foward to future S2250
Note: Carry Foward to future S2250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases Medicaid reimbursement rates for primary care services; appropriates $20 million.
Title
Increases Medicaid reimbursement rates for primary care services; appropriates $20 million.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Shama Haider [D] |
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health Committee |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4223 (Carry Over) 2023-06-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4223 (Carry Over) 2023-06-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2792 (Same As) 2023-06-27 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4223 (Carry Over) 2023-06-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2792 (Same As) 2023-06-27 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading