NJ A4218 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2691 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2691 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriation of $100,000 to Commission on Human Trafficking.
Title
Makes supplemental appropriation of $100,000 to Commission on Human Trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2691 (1R) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2691 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.258.