NJ A4208 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "New Jersey Complete Count Commission."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "New Jersey Complete Count Commission."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2730 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.115.
2018-06-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-21-2)
2018-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-06-25SenateEmergency Resolution (35-0) (Kean)
2018-06-25SenateSenate Amendment (36-0) (Kean)
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted for S2730 (2R)
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (53-22-2)
2018-06-21AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-18AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2730 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A4208 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback