NJ A4202 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.48.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.48.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes surtax on corporation business tax liability; decouples certain provisions from Internal Revenue Code; imposes tax on certain dividends.
Title
Imposes surtax on corporation business tax liability; decouples certain provisions from Internal Revenue Code; imposes tax on certain dividends.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 30 N: 43 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2746 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 30 N: 43 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2746 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.48. |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-15) |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (41-23-0) |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Motion Waive 22:4a (Pintor Marin)(42-19-0) |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-17) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S2746 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (42-33-0) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Bucco) (30-43-0) (Lost) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2746 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A4202