NJ A4181 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.129.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.129.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that employees of renaissance school projects are in State administered retirement systems.*
Title
Clarifies that employees of renaissance school projects are in State administered retirement systems.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2722 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2722 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-04 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.129. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-5) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (56-22-0) |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (27-1) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S2722 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (42-26-4) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2722 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A4181 (ACS)