NJ A4170 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2035
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts use of certain data collected for purposes of contact tracing related to COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Restricts use of certain data collected for purposes of contact tracing related to COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (55-18-1) |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4170 (Carry Over) 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2539 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2539 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee