NJ A4170 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-8)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.85.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2646 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.85.
2018-06-21SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-06-21SenateSubstituted for S2646
2018-06-21SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-1)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-06-11AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2646 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A4170

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback