NJ A4164 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S1603
Note: Carry Foward to future A3874

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes fringe benefit rate for State colleges and universities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes fringe benefit rate for State colleges and universities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2023-06-05AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2022-06-02AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4164 (Carry Over) 2023-06-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4164 (Carry Over) 2023-06-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2747 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback