NJ A4164 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2190
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1887 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1887 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development to establish pilot program to assist certain unemployed and underemployed individuals to complete industry-valued credentials in 12 months. *
Title
Directs Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development to establish pilot program to assist certain unemployed and underemployed individuals to complete industry-valued credentials in 12 months. *
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S1887 (2R) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1887 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.252.
A2190 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2190 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading