NJ A4164 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.218.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.218.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Auditor to annually report on unspent State account balances.
Title
Requires State Auditor to annually report on unspent State account balances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2588 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2588 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.218. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Substituted for S2588 (1R) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2588 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A4164 (1R)