NJ A4162 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1044
Note: Carry Foward to future S1441
Note: Carry Foward to future S1441
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Director of Division of Taxation to examine feasibilty of centralized property tax information system to verify property taxes paid by homestead property tax reimbursement claimants.
Title
Requires Director of Division of Taxation to examine feasibilty of centralized property tax information system to verify property taxes paid by homestead property tax reimbursement claimants.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. John DiMaio [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Rep. John Wisniewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4162 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4162 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2213 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4162 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2213 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee