NJ A4147 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A875
Note: Carry Foward to future S900
Note: Carry Foward to future S900
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Motion To Table (50-27-0) (Greenwald)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Motion To Table (50-27-0) (Greenwald)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits to 14 days effective period of certain emergency orders, rules, or regulations.
Title
Limits to 14 days effective period of certain emergency orders, rules, or regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Motion To Table (50-27-0) (Greenwald) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Motion Order of the Day (Bergen) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Motion To Table (44-25-0) (Greenwald) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Motion Relieve from ASL (Bergen) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Motion To Table (47-27-0) (Greenwald) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Motion Order of the Day (Bramnick) |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Voice) (Greenwald) |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Motion Order of the Day (Bramnick) |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4147 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Motion To Table (50-27-0) (Greenwald)
A4147 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Motion To Table (50-27-0) (Greenwald)
S2482 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Motion To Table (24-15) (Weinberg)
A4147 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Motion To Table (50-27-0) (Greenwald)
S2482 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Motion To Table (24-15) (Weinberg)