NJ A4135 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns use of digital parking meters to monitor parking compliance; establishes fund to encourage designated drivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns use of digital parking meters to monitor parking compliance; establishes fund to encourage designated drivers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (55-20-0)
2018-09-27AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-18AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-06-11AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2579 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Senate Amendment (18-8) (Sweeney)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback