NJ A4133 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - Substituted by S2937
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - Substituted by S2937
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to pension and health care benefits for public employees.
Title
Makes various changes to pension and health care benefits for public employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Substituted by S2937 | |
2011-06-20 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2937 (Same As) 2011-06-28 - Approved P.L.2011, c.78.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A4133 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4500/4133_I1.HTM |