NJ A4128 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2117
Note: Carry Foward to future S2010
Note: Carry Foward to future S2010
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-22 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-22 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes State Ombudsman to oversee application for and receipt of federal funds by State agencies.
Title
Establishes State Ombudsman to oversee application for and receipt of federal funds by State agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4128 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4128 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2792 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4128 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2792 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee