NJ A4125 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S107
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-06 - Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to not enact
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-06 - Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to not enact
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for reduced sales tax imposition on certain sales in certain Highlands Region Preservation Area municipalities.
Title
Provides for reduced sales tax imposition on certain sales in certain Highlands Region Preservation Area municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to not enact |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S888 (Same As) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S107 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S107 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A4125 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A4500/4125_I1.HTM |